CA SB1527 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 155.20 and 237 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: exemption: low-value properties and tribal housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 19. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 155.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 237 | Amended Code | Citation Text |