CA SB1513 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 11797 of the Insurance Code, relating to the State Compensation Insurance Fund.
Title
State Compensation Insurance Fund: investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1513 Negrete McLeod Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1513 Negrete McLeod Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1513 Negrete McLeod (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1513 Negrete McLeod Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1513 Negrete McLeod (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4629.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3649.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3598.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-14 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-08 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-07 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-25 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3143.) (April 11). | |
2012-03-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-03-23 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11797 | Amended Code | Citation Text |