CA SB1459 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 32004 to the Food and Agricultural Code, and to amend Section 597s of the Penal Code, relating to animals.
Title
Animal shelters: veterinarians.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Kate Sanchez [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 32004 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 597 | Amended Code | Citation Text |