CA SB1400 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76030 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: protective orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1400 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1400 Hancock (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1400 Hancock (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5964.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3591.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3340.) (April 30). |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |