CA SB1398 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.11 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: flood control activities: Salinas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1398&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1398_bill_20140221_introduced.html |