CA SB1379 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7522.56 and 21224 of the Government Code, relating to public retirement, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public Employees’ Retirement Law: reinstatement: County of Solano.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1379 Dodd Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 4.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3758.) (April 24). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 21224 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 7522.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |