CA SB136 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14199.85 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medi-Cal: managed care organization provider tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB136 B. & F.R. (Wiener) Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - SB 136 Budget and Fiscal Review Third Reading Urgency By GABRIEL (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB136 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - SB 136 Budget and Fiscal Review Third Reading Urgency By GABRIEL (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB136 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-03-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-03-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 3384.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 4397.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 14. Page 4315.) |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 497.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14199.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |