CA SB1318 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1248.15 of, to add Section 1228.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 1288.7 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to infectious diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities: influenza vaccinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-30 - Unfinished Business SB1318 Wolk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - SB 1318 Wolk Senate Third Reading By ATKINS (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1318 Wolk (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2012-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2012-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2012-08-30 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5007.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-28 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-28 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6449.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-24 Read third time and amended. (Page 6252.) Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-20 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-16 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2012-08-08 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-08-07 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-08-06 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2012-06-26 Hearing postponed by committee.
2012-06-14 Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2012-05-30 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-30 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 3710.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-29 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-25 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-05-09 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-08 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (May 7).
2012-04-27 Set for hearing May 7.
2012-04-25 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3310.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-24 Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2012-04-20 Set for hearing April 25.
2012-04-19 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3230.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-04-11 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2012-03-28 Set for hearing April 18.
2012-03-08 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2012-02-24 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2012-02-23 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1228.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1248.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1288.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1318&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120411_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120525_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120614_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120807_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120808_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120824_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_bill_20120905_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120418_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120425_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120507_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120530_0256PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120703_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120816_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120828_0240PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1318_vote_20120830_1253PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback