CA SB1283 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 372, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 372, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 11357.5 and 11375.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1283 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1283 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1283 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1283 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1283 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 372, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4801.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6048.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 5722.) . |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HIGHER ED. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3691.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 12.) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3218.) (April 22). |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11357.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11375.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |