CA SB1262 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3003, 3454, and 3455 of the Penal Code, relating to supervised release.
Title
Crimes: supervised release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [04-09-2024]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [04-09-2024]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | April 9 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1. Page 3534.) Reconsideration granted. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |