CA SB1251 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2056 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to mosquito abatement.
Title
Mosquito abatement inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3469.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E., U. & C. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 2056 | New Code | See Bill Text |