CA SB1248 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52074 of the Education Code, relating to public schools.
Title
California Collaborative for Educational Excellence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1248 Lara (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1248 Lara (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3607.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3712.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (April 24). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32320 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52074 | Amended Code | Citation Text |