CA SB1235 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1011, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1011, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 22780.1 to, and to add Division 9.5 (commencing with Section 22800) to, the Financial Code, relating to commercial financing.
Title
Commercial financing: disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1235 Glazer Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1235 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1235 Glazer (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1235 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1235 Glazer (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1011, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 6193.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to unfinished business. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 6184.) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Failed passage. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (August 31) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6145.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4460.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4997.) (May 8). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on I., B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22655 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22780.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22800 | New Code | See Bill Text |