CA SB1220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1045 of the Evidence Code, and to add Section 832.11 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace and custodial officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1220 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1220 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 Umberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1220 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 Umberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2020-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5285.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3876.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3770.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | May 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1045 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 832.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |