CA SB1220 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3749.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3749.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 27388.1 to the Government Code, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 50470) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing Opportunity and Market Stabilization (HOMeS)
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Curren Price [D] | Sen. Michael Rubio [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 DeSaulnier (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3749.) | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3593.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-07 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3304.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3314.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-04-18 | Set for hearing April 25 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27388.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50470 | New Code | See Bill Text |