CA SB1194 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42358.1 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: plastic products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42358.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |