CA SB1154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14087.9726 and 14301.3 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: beneficiaries with HIV or AIDS: managed care plans: reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4746.) (April 18). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.306 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.9726 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14301.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |