CA SB1103 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-29 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-29 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 85201.5 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: candidacy for elective state office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1103 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1103 Padilla (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1103 Padilla (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6540.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 13). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 3781.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3709.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3233.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 85200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85201.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |