CA SB1059 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 16005 and 16106 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 37101 of the Government Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: local taxation: gross receipts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3698.) (April 22). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3563.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B., P. & E. D. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 16106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 37101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |