CA SB1018 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 218 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electrical corporation: definition: exclusion of certain solar or wind generating technologies.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |