CA SB1016 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 131250) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 112 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 18928.6 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to data collection.
Title
Latino and Indigenous Disparities Reduction Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (April 10). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3427.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 131250 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18928.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |