CA SB1015 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Jun 11 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Jun 11 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2785.6 and 2786 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nursing schools and programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1015 Cortese et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3968.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3511.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2785.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |