CA AR86 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Khmer New Year.
Title
Relative to Khmer New Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - HR 86 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Essayli. To Third Reading. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Introduced. |