CA AR45 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-19)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5795.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5795.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the California-Ukraine National Guard Partnership.
Title
Relative to the California-Ukraine National Guard Partnership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5795.). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Introduced. |