CA ACR125 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organ donation.
Title
Donate Life California Day: driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - Senate - Special Consent #12 ACR125 John A. P (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3243.) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 4355.) Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4355.) |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. Assembly Rule 49(c) suspended. (Page 4242.) |