CA ACR102 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Firefighters Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Firefighters Memorial Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-27 - Special Consent #19 ACR102 Fox (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-09AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m.
2014-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2014-08-27SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4904.)
2014-08-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2014-08-18SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-14AssemblyAmended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 6014.)
2014-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 11).
2014-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2014-02-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2014-02-20AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback