CA AB857 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 16520, 23910, and 30105 of, and to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 29180) to Division 7 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: identifying information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Assembly - AB 857 COOPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Cooper By Jackson (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 857 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Cooper By Jackson (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 857 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 5592.). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 3903.). |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2016-05-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1718.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29180 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |