CA AB852 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1720.7 to the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: prevailing wages.
Sponsors
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 852 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB852 Burke By Galgiani (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - AB 852 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB852 Burke By Galgiani (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - AB 852 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 2904.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2432.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 1143.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 22). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |