CA AB690 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 99500) to, to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 99520) to, Title 20 of, and to repeal Chapter 8.1 (commencing with Section 8710) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: international relations.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Eric Linder [R] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - AB 690 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB690 Campos By Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 690 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB690 Campos By Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 690 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6175.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4464.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3715.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | Pass and retain by unanimous consent. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 15). |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |