CA AB66 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6254.31 to the Government Code, and to add Sections 830.16, 830.17, 830.18, and 830.19 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: body-worn cameras.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 14). |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 17. |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6254.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 830.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |