CA AB60 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1653.5, 12800, 12801, and 12801.5 of, and to add Sections 12801.9, 12801.10, and 12801.11 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to driver's licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses: eligibility: required documentation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-12 - AB 60 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - W/O REF. TO FILE AB60 Alejo By De Le (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - AB 60 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-03 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
2013-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3353.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 3357.).
2013-09-12SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 2406.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2406.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2411.).
2013-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-09-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-19SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-08-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-07-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 2).
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2013-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 1715.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-01-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2013-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_60&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130107_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130416_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130708_amended_sen_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130708_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130107_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130416_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130708_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130903_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130906_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130912_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20130916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_bill_20131003_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130422_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130529_1137AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130702_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130819_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130830_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130912_0330PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_60_vote_20130912_0933PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback