CA AB576 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14131.07 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: reimbursement for abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB576 Weber et al. By Ashby (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 576 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 576 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-07 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2552.). |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 2023.) |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 30 corrected. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14131.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |