CA AB548 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 78261.5 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: community college registered nursing programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Assembly - AB 548 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB548 Salas (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Assembly - AB 548 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB548 Salas (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Assembly - AB 548 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5839.). |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4255.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3743.) |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78261.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |