CA AB52 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.90 and 23623 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income tax credit: sales and use taxes paid: manufacturing equipment: research and development equipment.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Blanca Pacheco [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Asm. Avelino Valencia [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 52 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 52 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1705.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |