CA AB474 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 30324 of the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Coastal Commission: ex parte communications: disclosure forms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-07-03 - Consent Calendar 2nd AB474 Stone (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - AB 474 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014.
2014-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2014-07-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2014-07-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4253.).
2014-07-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-06-30SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2014-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2014-02-06SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2014-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3726.)
2014-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-01-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2014-01-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2013-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code30324Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16516.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_474&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_bill_20130219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_bill_20130219_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_bill_20140106_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_bill_20140709_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_bill_20140716_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_vote_20140113_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_vote_20140123_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_vote_20140129_1245PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_vote_20140610_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_vote_20140617_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_474_vote_20140703_1252PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback