CA AB474 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 444, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 444, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1102.6b of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 5898.12, 5898.14, 5898.20, 5898.21, 5898.22, 5898.24, 5898.28, and 5898.30 of, and to add Section 5898.31 to, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to contractual assessments.
Title
Contractual assessments: water efficiency improvements.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Berryhill [R] | Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Danny Gilmore [R] |
Asm. Paul Krekorian [D] | Asm. Brian Nestande [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Assembly - AB 474 Blumenfield Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB474 Blumenfield By Price (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 474 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB474 Blumenfield By Price (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 474 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 444, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-10 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3294.) | |
2009-09-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2317.) | |
2009-09-08 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 1606.) | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1530.). | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1102.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |