CA AB44 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15601, 15620, 15621, 15626, 15627, and 15632, of, to add Sections 15621.5 and 19204.5 to, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 15645) to Chapter 9 of Division 15 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: statewide recounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-09 - Assembly - AB 44 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Mullin By Hertzberg (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 44 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Mullin By Hertzberg (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 44 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 3027.). |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.) |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2459.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 1766.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 15370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15621.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 15626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15645 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 19203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19204.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |