CA AB330 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-19 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-19 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 69433.2 and 94878 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 330 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 330 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 3721.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69433.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94878 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94929.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |