CA AB3221 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1380, 1381, and 1386 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to records.
Title
Department of Managed Health Care: review of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1381 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |