CA AB312 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on August 5 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-08-05 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 51.7 of the Civil Code, relating to civil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights: homeless persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-07-14 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB312 Bonnie Lowenthal By Evans (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - AB 312 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-05 Vetoed by Governor.
2011-07-25 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2011-07-14 In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2011-07-14 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1852.).
2011-06-28 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-06-27 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2011-06-07 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-05-26 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-05-16 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-16 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1385.)
2011-04-14 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-04-13 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
2011-04-11 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-07 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2011-04-06 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-03-30 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-29 Read second time and amended.
2011-03-25 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 22).
2011-02-24 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-02-10 From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2011-02-09 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code51.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_312&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_bill_20110209_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_bill_20110329_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_bill_20110407_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_bill_20110718_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_vote_20110322_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_vote_20110413_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_vote_20110516_0109PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_vote_20110607_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_312_vote_20110714_1231PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback