CA AB3116 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65915 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing development: density bonuses: student housing developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |