CA AB3035 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17021.8 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Agricultural employee housing: streamlined, ministerial approval: Counties of Santa Clara and Santa Cruz.
Sponsors
Asm. Gail Pellerin [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 17021.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |