CA AB2871 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 10.1 (commencing with Section 11675) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Overdose fatality review teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11675 | New Code | See Bill Text |