CA AB2675 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65400 of, and to add Section 65584.10 to, the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and zoning: regional housing needs: exchange of allocation.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |