CA AB2673 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1377 of the Penal Code, relating to civil compromise.
Title
Civil compromise: hit and run.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2673 Bradford By Mitchell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2673 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2673 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4950.). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 4946.) |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |