CA AB2656 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.114 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.114 | New Code | See Bill Text |