CA AB2646 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 912, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 912, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53.7 to the Civil Code, relating to civil rights.
Title
Civil rights: political structure equal protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2646 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2646 Ting By Lara (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2646 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2646 Ting By Lara (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2646 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 912, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 6671.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6459.) |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4611.). |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 4948.) |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 231.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 53.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |