CA AB2619 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5937 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to water.
Title
Dams: fish: critically dry year.
Sponsors
Asm. Beth Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 5937 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |