CA AB2560 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65915 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Density Bonus Law: California Coastal Act of 1976.
Sponsors
Asm. David Alvarez [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |