CA AB256 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 700, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 700, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48900 of the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: grounds for suspension and expulsion: bullying.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB256 Garcia By Wyland (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 256 GARCIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 256 GARCIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 700, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2176.). |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 1474.) |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |